This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/22/2020 at 01:31:08 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Rolland Charles Hanley, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Rolland Charles Hanley, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hollman, James, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Breen, Thomas P., Bacciarini, Mark, Slocum, Steven, Lo, Paul and LaPorte, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3828

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hollman, James

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Breen, Thomas P.

Bacciarini, Mark

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

LaPorte, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Hanley, Rolland Charles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Silveira, Nicole A.

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Margain, Andre Carlos

Creeger, Matthew L

Defendant Attorneys

Meyer, Derek Scott

Andrade, Vincent

Samrao, Ramnik S

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Probation Violation

01/24/2020: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

01/24/2020: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

01/24/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Collection Statement

12/16/2019: Collection Statement

Returned Mail

12/16/2019: Returned Mail

Collection Statement

11/26/2019: Collection Statement

Order

11/25/2019: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/25/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Order

10/28/2019: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/28/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

10/21/2019: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

10/21/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/18/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/11/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

10/07/2019: Release Order

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

10/07/2019: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Criminal: Minute Order

10/07/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/03/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC211: Robbery; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 01/24/2020; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 30 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 4 Days; Comment: VOP; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 10/28/2019; Term: 60 Months; End Date: 10/27/2024; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VOP#1 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VOP#1 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Hanley, Rolland Charles; Charge #: 002; Description: VOP#1 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Probation Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: VOP - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Hanley, Rolland Charles; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialHanley, Rolland Charles; Transaction Assessment; $1275.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialHanley, Rolland Charles; Transaction Assessment; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Hanley, Rolland Charles; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: LaPorte, James; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: LaPorte, James; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Samrao, Ramnik S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Hanley, Rolland Charles; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Hanley, Rolland Charles; Charge #: 001; Description: PC211: Robbery; Statute: 211; Level: Felony - Second Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Creeger, Matthew L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silveira, Nicole A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margain, Andre Carlos