This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/08/2022 at 18:08:20 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Roger Lamar Davis, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Roger Lamar Davis, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6270

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Davis, Roger Lamar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Margain, Andre Carlos

Silveira, Nicole A.

Defendant Attorneys

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Meyer, Derek Scott

 

Court Documents

Complaint PC1551.1: Fugitive From Justice - Warrantless

12/28/2021: Complaint PC1551.1: Fugitive From Justice - Warrantless

Criminal: Minute Order

12/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/03/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/05/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Waiver

01/05/2022: Waiver

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketProbable Cause; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC1551.1: Fugitive From Justice:Warrantless Arrest; Extradition Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Davis, Roger Lamar; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Davis, Roger Lamar; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Davis, Roger Lamar; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint PC1551.1: Fugitive From Justice - Warrantless

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Davis, Roger Lamar; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1551.1: Fugitive From Justice:Warrantless Arrest; Statute: 1551.1; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meyer, Derek Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene