This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/19/2020 at 16:35:37 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Robert Hames, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/30/2015 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Robert Hames, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lacy, Edward M., Bissig, Louis F., Schechter, Jeanne, McNatt, Bobby W., Shaver, Donald, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Ash, Carol, Breen, Thomas P., Fredricks, Josh M., Power, David E., Slocum, Steven, Dougherty, Frank and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5241

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lacy, Edward M.

Bissig, Louis F.

Schechter, Jeanne

McNatt, Bobby W.

Shaver, Donald

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Ash, Carol

Breen, Thomas P.

Fredricks, Josh M.

Power, David E.

Slocum, Steven

Dougherty, Frank

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Hames, Robert Aaron

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Nored, Thane

Compton, Misty

McKean, Tyler

Asdorian, Blake M

Taylor-Boreham, Anne Kathryn

Hanson, Ann

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

Samrao, Ramnik S

McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Freitas, Wade

Lope, Armando

Andrade, Vincent

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

Berger, Richard

Noguera, Michael Anthony

 

Court Documents

Proof

01/28/2019: Proof

Criminal: Minute Order

01/28/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/26/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/15/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/01/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/01/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

07/20/2018: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

07/20/2018: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

07/10/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/26/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/26/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/29/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/25/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/31/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/03/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Evaluation Request

08/09/2016: Evaluation Request

Notice

06/17/2016: Notice

Evaluation Request

04/21/2016: Evaluation Request

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof: Community Service; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M; Defendant: Hames, Robert Aaron; Deputy Public Defender: McInally, Nicholas Bernard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof: Community Service; Judicial Officer: Breen, Thomas P.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M; Defendant: Hames, Robert Aaron; Deputy Public Defender: McInally, Nicholas Bernard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof: Community Service; Judicial Officer: Fredricks, Josh M.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M; Defendant: Hames, Robert Aaron; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof: Community Service; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Hames, Robert Aaron

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Lacy, Edward M.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Hames, Robert Aaron

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCitation: Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377(a): Possession Of A Controlled Substance; Probation; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 07/03/2017; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 07/03/2020; Status; Status: Active; Date: 07/03/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 07/10/2018; Comment; Comment: ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Bissig, Louis F.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Hames, Robert Aaron; Deputy Public Defender: Berger, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Hames, Robert Aaron; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Hames, Robert Aaron; Charge #: 003; Description: HS11377(a): Possession Of A Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Hames, Robert Aaron; Charge #: 004; Description: PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Hames, Robert Aaron; Charge #: 002; Description: HS11364.1(a)(1): Possession of Injection/Injestion Device; Statute: HS113364.1(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Hames, Robert Aaron; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11377(a): Possession Of A Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Freitas, Wade

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony