This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/18/2020 at 13:56:18 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Richard Maya, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Richard Maya, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Breen, Thomas P., Mewhinney, Douglas V., Ash, Carol, Moranda, David, Kirihara, John, Shaver, Donald, Slocum, Steven and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0072

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Breen, Thomas P.

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Ash, Carol

Moranda, David

Kirihara, John, Shaver, Donald

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Maya, Richard Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Bakich, Donna

Pfeiff, Thomas M

Min, Thomas Keynes

Compton, Misty

Defendant Attorneys

Foster, Douglas

Rodriguez, Adam J

Andrade, Vincent

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Green, Anthony C

Reed, Katharine

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

02/03/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/30/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/14/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

01/09/2020: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/30/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/11/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/27/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/06/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/09/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Probation Orders

08/06/2019: Probation Orders

Payment Plan

08/06/2019: Payment Plan

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

07/01/2019: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Criminal: Minute Order

07/01/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/03/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/13/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/18/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Fingerprint Card

01/14/2019: Fingerprint Card

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DispositionAmended Prison; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC211: Robbery; Prison; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 07/01/2019; Term: 36 Months; End Date: 02/20/2020; Status; Status: Active; Date: 07/01/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 01/09/2020; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 01/30/2020; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 02/20/2020; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 02/20/2020; Fee Totals; $30.00; $40.00; Fee Totals; $70.00; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 02/20/2020; Term Type: Lower; Term: 2 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 311 Days; Conduct Credit: 46 Days; Comment: Count 1, felony; Condition - Adult; Fee Totals; $300.00; Fee Totals; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 004; VOP # 2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 004; VOP # 2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialMaya, Richard Thomas; Transaction Assessment; $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Original Type: Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Maya, Richard Thomas; Contract Public Defender: Foster, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Original Type: Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Maya, Richard Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Maya, Richard Thomas; Contract Public Defender: Rodriguez, Adam J

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Maya, Richard Thomas; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC211: Robbery; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFingerprint Card; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Maya, Richard Thomas; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer(s): Kirihara, John, Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Bakich, Donna; Defendant: Maya, Richard Thomas; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Maya, Richard Thomas; Charge #: 004; Description: VOP # 2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Maya, Richard Thomas; Charge #: 002; Description: PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Maya, Richard Thomas; Charge #: 001; Description: PC211: Robbery; Statute: 211; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed, Katharine

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Anthony Charles