This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 09/05/2021 at 18:01:50 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Richard Araujoaguilar, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Richard Araujoaguilar, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Lo, Paul and Hashimoto, Roy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2782

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

Hashimoto, Roy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Araujoaguilar, Richard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Silveira, Nicole A.

Nored, Thane

Defendant Attorneys

Johnson, Mark A

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

08/26/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/12/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Report

08/04/2021: Report

Criminal: Minute Order

08/04/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/28/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Declaration

07/12/2021: Declaration

Criminal: Minute Order

07/12/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

07/07/2021: Complaint

Complaint

07/07/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

07/07/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Araujoaguilar, Richard; Contract Public Defender: Johnson, Mark A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Araujoaguilar, Richard; Contract Public Defender: Johnson, Mark A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReport

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Araujoaguilar, Richard; Contract Public Defender: Johnson, Mark A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hashimoto, Roy; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Araujoaguilar, Richard; Contract Public Defender: Johnson, Mark A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketPretrial Electronic Monitoring Program Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Araujoaguilar, Richard; Contract Public Defender: Johnson, Mark A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Araujoaguilar, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Araujoaguilar, Richard; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Johnson, Mark A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent