This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/04/2022 at 18:01:17 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Ricardo Carlos Sanchez, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ricardo Carlos Sanchez, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol and Lo, Paul. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Sanchez, Ricardo Carlos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Margain, Andre Carlos

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Rosenthal, Sara R

Min, Thomas Keynes

Defendant Attorneys

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Coughlin, Michael

Green, Anthony Charles

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/03/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/03/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/06/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/11/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/14/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/25/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/31/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/17/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/24/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Evaluation Request

02/24/2022: Evaluation Request

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1368; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvaluation Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Sanchez, Ricardo Carlos; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Sanchez, Ricardo Carlos; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Sanchez, Ricardo Carlos; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Sanchez, Ricardo Carlos; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Sanchez, Ricardo Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Sanchez, Ricardo Carlos; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony Charles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Sanchez, Ricardo Carlos; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Serratto, Matthew Travers; Defendant: Sanchez, Ricardo Carlos; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Sanchez, Ricardo Carlos; Charge #: 002; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Sanchez, Ricardo Carlos; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Anthony Charles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene