This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/16/2020 at 14:29:22 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Raymond Chase, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Raymond Chase, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bissig, Louis F., Schechter, Jeanne, Shaver, Donald, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Ash, Carol, Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Hansen, Ronald and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2999

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bissig, Louis F.

Schechter, Jeanne

Shaver, Donald

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Ash, Carol

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Hansen, Ronald

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Chase, Raymond Stacy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Min, Thomas K

McAfee, Michael

McConney, Adam D

Sandhaus, David

Hanson, Ann

Wall, Walter W.

McKean, Tyler

Defendant Attorneys

Samrao, Ramnik S

Freitas, Wade

Meyer, Derek Scott

Lope, Armando

Lyon, Paul J

Andrade, Vincent

Jamieson, Stephanie L

Loethen, Christopher Paul

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

04/25/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/18/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/15/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/04/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/07/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/21/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/08/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/03/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/29/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Evaluation Request

06/06/2018: Evaluation Request

Criminal: Minute Order

05/30/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/03/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/01/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

11/30/2017: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/30/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/19/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/16/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC647(a): Disorderly Conduct:Solicit Lewd Act; Probation; Fee Totals; $220.00; Fee Totals; $220.00; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 07/29/2015; Term: 36 Months; End Date: 04/25/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 07/29/2015; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 04/25/2019; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 07/29/2015; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 100 Days; Suspended: 100 Days; Suspended Reason: Program Referral; Comment; Comment: (Defendant is ordered to the Court Mental Health Program.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Withdrawn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Chase, Raymond Stacy; Deputy Public Defender: Jamieson, Stephanie L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Chase, Raymond Stacy; Deputy Public Defender: Jamieson, Stephanie L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Jamieson, Stephanie L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Chase, Raymond Stacy; Deputy Public Defender: Jamieson, Stephanie L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketProgress Report; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Chase, Raymond Stacy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketTime Not Waived; Judicial Officer: Mewhinney, Douglas V.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketMotion; Judicial Officer: Mewhinney, Douglas V.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McConney, Adam D; Defendant: Chase, Raymond Stacy; Deputy Public Defender: Samrao, Ramnik S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketTime Not Waived; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McConney, Adam D; Defendant: Chase, Raymond Stacy; Deputy Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC314.1: Indecent Exposure; Not Guilty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketTime Not Waived; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McConney, Adam D; Defendant: Chase, Raymond Stacy; Deputy Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Chase, Raymond Stacy; Charge #: 001; Description: PC647(a): Disorderly Conduct:Solicit Lewd Act; Statute: 647(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Freitas, Wade

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Loethen, Christopher Paul

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lyon, Paul J