Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/09/2020 at 00:28:03 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Raul Fimbrez Jr, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Raul Fimbrez Jr, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Fredricks, Josh M., Shaver, Donald and Kirihara, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3093

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Fredricks, Josh M.

Shaver, Donald

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Fimbrez, Raul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Boyer, Kayla A

Asdorian, Blake M

Defendant Attorneys

Meyer, Derek Scott

Lope, Armando

Chu, Erica Joy Galeon

Partin, Lauri Louise

Rhee, Christopher

Noguera, Michael Anthony

Reed, Katharine

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/19/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/24/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/15/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Collection Statement

01/14/2020: Collection Statement

Criminal: Minute Order

11/05/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/15/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/07/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/04/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/07/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/01/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/06/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/28/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

06/18/2018: Notice

Complaint

06/18/2018: Complaint

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Original Type: Arraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Fimbrez, Raul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketRequest to Appear (With Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 02/03/2020; Start Time: 12:00 PM; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 5 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 0 Day; Comment: Count 1-Miosdemeanor. The Court has no objections to the defendant applying for alternative sentencing. The Defendant is advised to apply today 1/15/2020. Reporting is to commence 2/3/2020 if not enrolled.; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 11/05/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 11/05/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 11/05/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 02/24/2020; Comment: FTA Proof AA/NA; Programs; AA/NA Meetings; Ordered; Order Date: 11/05/2019; Complete By: 05/05/2020; Comment: 50 sessions; Fee Totals; $220.03; Fee Totals; $220.03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Fimbrez, Raul; Charge #: 003; Description: PC166.4: Failure To Comply W/Court Order; Statute: 166.4; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketProbation is revoked; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof; Original Type: Proof; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketProof; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DispositionAmended Sentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 02/03/2020; Start Time: 12:00 PM; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 5 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 0 Day; Comment: Count 1-Miosdemeanor. The Court has no objections to the defendant applying for alternative sentencing. The Defendant is advised to apply today 1/15/2020. Reporting is to commence 2/3/2020 if not enrolled.; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 11/05/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 11/04/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 11/05/2019; Programs; AA/NA Meetings; Ordered; Order Date: 11/05/2019; Complete By: 05/05/2020; Comment: 50 sessions; Fee Totals; $220.03; Fee Totals; $220.03

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant: Fimbrez, Raul Jr; Deputy Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M; Defendant: Fimbrez, Raul Jr; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant: Fimbrez, Raul Jr; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; HS11364: Possess Controlled Substance Paraphernalia; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Fimbrez, Raul Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Fimbrez, Raul; Charge #: 002; Description: HS11364: Possess Controlled Substance Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Fimbrez, Raul; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boyer, Kayla A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Asdorian, Blake M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Enero, Natalia Ruth