This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/30/2020 at 20:36:53 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Rafael Herrera, Junior, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Rafael Herrera, Junior, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hollman, James, Kirihara, John, Shaver, Donald, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry, Slocum, Steven, Lo, Paul and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0076

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hollman, James

Kirihara, John

Shaver, Donald

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Herrera, Rafael, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Compton, Misty

Rosenthal, Sara R

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Creeger, Matthew L

Min, Thomas Keynes

Defendant Attorneys

Samrao, Ramnik S

Green, Anthony C

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

10/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/07/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/04/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/09/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/26/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/21/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/15/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/25/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

03/28/2019: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

03/19/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/19/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/07/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/21/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/07/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/31/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/15/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/19/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/11/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • DispositionAmended Sentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; **PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Sentence; Charge Number: 002; **HS11364(a): Unlawful to Possess Pipe or any Device; Sentence; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 03/21/2017; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 03/21/2020; Status; Status: Active; Date: 03/21/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 06/19/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 03/19/2019; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 10/22/2019; Programs; BTP: 52 Week Class; Ordered; Party: Herrera, Rafael, Junior; Order Date: 03/21/2017; Enroll by Date: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Herrera, Rafael, Junior; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Herrera, Rafael, Junior; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Herrera, Rafael, Junior; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Herrera, Rafael, Junior

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Herrera, Rafael, Junior; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colacito, Anthony Michael; Defendant: Herrera, Rafael, Junior; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 005; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketCitation: Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Herrera, Rafael, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2017
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; HS11364(a): Unlawful to Possess Pipe or any Device; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Herrera, Rafael, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Herrera, Rafael, Junior; Charge #: 002; Description: HS11364(a): Unlawful to Possess Pipe or any Device; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Herrera, Rafael, Junior; Charge #: 002; Description: **HS11364(a): Unlawful to Possess Pipe or any Device; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Herrera, Rafael, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Herrera, Rafael, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samrao, Ramnik S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon