This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/15/2020 at 15:34:29 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Rachael Williams, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 05/29/2015 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Rachael Williams, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schechter, Jeanne and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2342

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schechter, Jeanne

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Williams, Rachael Rudya

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tresidder, Joseph M.

Turner, Leslie Allan

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Berger, Richard

Pfeiff, Thomas M

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/29/2015: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketProbation is revoked; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketProof; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 06/03/2015; Consecutive: with CRM023589; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 30 Days; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 06/03/2015; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 06/02/2018; Status; Status: Active; Date: 06/03/2015; Fee Totals; $150.00; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $220.00; Comment; Comment: (); Programs; BTP: 52 Week Class; Ordered; Order Date: 06/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • FinancialWilliams, Rachael Rudya; Transaction Assessment; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Tresidder, Joseph M.; Defendant: Williams, Rachael Rudya; Contract Public Defender: Pfeiff, Thomas M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Turner, Leslie Allan; Defendant: Williams, Rachael Rudya; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Williams, Rachael Rudya; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less