This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 16:02:05 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Pearl Guillermina Baeza, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Pearl Guillermina Baeza, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4522

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Baeza, Pearl Guillermina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lozano, Angelica

Colby, Travis

Defendant Attorneys

Foster, Douglas

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

09/23/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Bail Bond

09/20/2021: Bail Bond

Complaint

09/17/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/17/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Lozano, Angelica; Defendant: Baeza, Pearl Guillermina; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Booking Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273A(a): Child Abuse; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Lozano, Angelica; Defendant: Baeza, Pearl Guillermina; Contract Public Defender: Foster, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Baeza, Pearl Guillermina; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273A(a): Child Abuse; Statute: 273A(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foster, Douglas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent