This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:18:16 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Paul Demarcus Glenn, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Paul Demarcus Glenn, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol, Schechter, Jeanne, Lo, Paul, Slocum, Steven and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******663B

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Schechter, Jeanne

Lo, Paul

Slocum, Steven

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Glenn, Paul Demarcus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McCoy, Tyson John

Bakich, Donna

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Defendant Attorneys

Richter, Jonathan J

Foster, Douglas

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

02/09/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Verdict

12/17/2020: Verdict

Verdict

12/17/2020: Verdict

Verdict

12/17/2020: Verdict

Verdict

12/17/2020: Verdict

Verdict

12/17/2020: Verdict

Converted Minute Order

12/17/2020: Converted Minute Order

Converted Minute Order

12/16/2020: Converted Minute Order

Converted Minute Order

12/15/2020: Converted Minute Order

Converted Minute Order

12/11/2020: Converted Minute Order

Converted Minute Order

12/10/2020: Converted Minute Order

Converted Minute Order

12/09/2020: Converted Minute Order

Converted Minute Order

12/08/2020: Converted Minute Order

Converted Minute Order

12/04/2020: Converted Minute Order

Brief

12/03/2020: Brief

Converted Minute Order

12/03/2020: Converted Minute Order

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial; Original Type: Jury Trial; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant: Glenn, Paul Demarcus; Contract Public Defender: Richter, Jonathan J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReadiness Conference; Original Type: Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant: Glenn, Paul Demarcus; Contract Public Defender: Richter, Jonathan J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Original Type: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Enero, Natalia Ruth; Defendant: Glenn, Paul Demarcus; Contract Public Defender: Richter, Jonathan J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 004; **PC211: Robbery; Conviction - Jury Verdict of Guilty; Charge Number: 004; **PC12022.53(b): Used Firearm; Found Not True by Jury; Charge Number: 004; **PC12022.53(c): Fire Firearm; Found Not True by Jury; Charge Number: 004; **PC12022(a)(1): Involve Firearm:Armed Or Not; Found True by Jury; Charge Number: 005; **PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Found Not Guilty by Jury; Charge Number: 005; **PC12022.5(a): Used Firearm:Commission Of Fel; Found Not True by Jury; Charge Number: 008; **PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Conviction - Jury Verdict of Guilty; Charge Number: 009; **PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Conviction - Jury Verdict of Guilty; Charge Number: 010; **VC10851(a): Take Vehicle Without Owners Consent; Conviction - Jury Verdict of Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConverted Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerdict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerdict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerdict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerdict

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Glenn, Paul Demarcus; Charge #: 003; Description: **PC213(a)(1)(A): Robbery Committed By Two Or More People; Statute: 213(a)(1)(A); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Glenn, Paul Demarcus; Charge #: 003; Description: PC213(a)(1)(A): Robbery Committed By Two Or More People; Statute: 213(a)(1)(A); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Glenn, Paul Demarcus; Charge #: 002; Description: PC12022.5(a): Used Firearm:Commission Of Fel; Statute: 12022.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Glenn, Paul Demarcus; Charge #: 002; Description: **PC12022.5(a): Used Firearm:Commission Of Fel; Statute: 12022.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Glenn, Paul Demarcus; Charge #: 002; Description: PC245(d)(1): Assault With Firearm On Peace Officer/Firearm; Statute: 245(d)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Glenn, Paul Demarcus; Charge #: 002; Description: **PC245(d)(1): Assault With Firearm On Peace Officer/Firearm; Statute: 245(d)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Glenn, Paul Demarcus; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC12022.53(c): Fire Firearm; Statute: 12022.53(c); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Glenn, Paul Demarcus; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022.53(c): Fire Firearm; Statute: 12022.53(c); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Glenn, Paul Demarcus; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC664/187(a): Attempted Murder; Statute: 664/187(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Glenn, Paul Demarcus; Charge #: 001; Description: PC664/187(a): Attempted Murder; Statute: 664/187(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McCoy, Tyson John

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bakich, Donna

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Enero, Natalia Ruth