Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/25/2020 at 19:37:56 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Patrick Wiens, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 07/19/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Patrick Wiens, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacobs, Harry, Slocum, Steven, Lo, Paul, Schechter, Jeanne and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4819

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jacobs, Harry

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

Schechter, Jeanne

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Wiens, Patrick Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Compton, Misty

Creeger, Matthew L

Colacito, Anthony Michael

Wall, Walter W.

Defendant Attorneys

Meyer, Derek Scott

Coughlin, Michael

Lee, Beth A

Andrade, Vincent

Mclean, Todd Eugene

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

03/24/2020: Notice of Hearing

Notice

03/11/2020: Notice

Notice

03/11/2020: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

02/25/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/23/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Revised FTP 2nd Courtesy Notice

04/27/2019: Revised FTP 2nd Courtesy Notice

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

04/03/2019: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

Returned Mail

03/28/2019: Returned Mail

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

03/13/2019: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

Memorandum

02/22/2018: Memorandum

Criminal: Minute Order

09/15/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

09/14/2017: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Returned Mail

05/02/2017: Returned Mail

Court Collections Communication

01/30/2017: Court Collections Communication

Order

12/19/2016: Order

Declaration

11/28/2016: Declaration

Notice

10/06/2016: Notice

* Public *

10/04/2016: * Public *

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketTransfer Out; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketTransfer Out; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC236: False Imprisonment; Probation; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 10/07/2016; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 02/25/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 10/07/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 11/23/2016; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 12/19/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 09/15/2017; Status; Status: Extended; Date: 02/25/2020; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 02/25/2020; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 09/15/2017; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 60 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 30 Days; Conduct Credit: 30 Days; Comment: VOP #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 004; VOP#2-PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 004; VOP#2-PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketVeterans Treatment Court Progress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Drexel, Scott Gregory; Defendant: Wiens, Patrick Michael; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Wiens, Patrick Michael; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Drexel, Scott Gregory; Defendant: Wiens, Patrick Michael; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Wall, Walter W.; Defendant: Wiens, Patrick Michael; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Wiens, Patrick Michael; Charge #: 001; Description: PC236: False Imprisonment; Statute: 236; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meyer, Derek Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, Beth A