This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/13/2022 at 17:23:56 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Nila Snyder, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Nila Snyder, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0434

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Snyder, Nila Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Min, Thomas Keynes

Asdorian, Blake M.

Compton, Misty

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Lee, Beth A

Coughlin, Michael

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/24/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/24/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/27/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/01/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/08/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/14/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/28/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/01/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Minute Order - Printed copy with signature

03/01/2022: Minute Order - Printed copy with signature

Collection Statement

03/02/2022: Collection Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 03/01/2022; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 137 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 69 Days; Conduct Credit: 68 Days; Comment: Count 2 - Misdemeanor (Credit for time served); Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 03/01/2022; Term: 1 Year; End Date: 02/28/2023; Status; Status: Active; Date: 03/01/2022; Fee Totals; $150.00; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC243(c)(2): Battery On A Peace Officer With Injury; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 001; PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Stricken; Charge Number: 002; PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 002; PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Stricken; Charge Number: 003; PC242: Battery; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • FinancialSnyder, Nila Marie; Transaction Assessment; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order - Printed copy with signature

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDefense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketPlea Certified by Clerk of the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCourt Found Plea Knowledgeable; Intelligently Made Voluntary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront And Cross Examine Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 004; PC243(b): Battery On Peace Officer/Etc; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Snyder, Nila Marie; Charge #: 004; Description: PC243(b): Battery On Peace Officer/Etc; Statute: 243(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Snyder, Nila Marie; Charge #: 003; Description: PC242: Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Snyder, Nila Marie; Charge #: 002; Description: PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 1203(e)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Snyder, Nila Marie; Charge #: 002; Description: PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Statute: 69; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Snyder, Nila Marie; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 1203(e)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Snyder, Nila Marie; Charge #: 001; Description: PC243(c)(2): Battery On A Peace Officer With Injury; Statute: 243(c)(2); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, Beth A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent