This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/07/2022 at 17:00:52 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Nathan Kyle Brady, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Nathan Kyle Brady, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald, Lo, Paul and Foster, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0712

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Lo, Paul

Foster, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

BRADY, NATHAN KYLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosenthal, Sara R

Newman, Jeffrey Samuel

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Haro, Quetzalli G.

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

02/07/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

02/07/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

02/14/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/18/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

02/18/2022: Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Release Order

02/18/2022: Release Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketProof; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketReadiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DispositionDiversion Referral; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Diversion Referral; Programs; BTP: 34 Week Class; Ordered; Order Date: 02/18/2022; Comment: Enroll within 30 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Diversion Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Plea Entered - Not Accepted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDefense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: BRADY, NATHAN KYLE; Deputy Public Defender: Haro, Quetzalli G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketMotion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Newman, Jeffrey Samuel; Defendant: BRADY, NATHAN KYLE; Deputy Public Defender: Haro, Quetzalli G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: BRADY, NATHAN KYLE; Deputy Public Defender: Coughlin, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2022
  • ChargeCharges: BRADY, NATHAN KYLE; Charge #: 002; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2022
  • ChargeCharges: BRADY, NATHAN KYLE; Charge #: 001; Description: PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Michael