This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/05/2020 at 12:03:03 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Nadine Ann Fernandez, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 11/29/2017 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Nadine Ann Fernandez, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirihara, John, Ash, Carol, Bacciarini, Mark, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Slocum, Steven, Hansen, Ronald and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7357

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirihara, John

Ash, Carol

Bacciarini, Mark

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Slocum, Steven

Hansen, Ronald

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Fernandez, Nadine Ann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Rosenthal, Sara R

Silveira, Nicole A.

Gates, Kathryn

Min, Thomas Keynes

Turner, Leslie Allan

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Meyer, Derek Scott

Berger, Richard

Andrade, Vincent

Samrao, Ramnik S

Loethen, Christopher Paul

 

Court Documents

Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

04/08/2019: Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Criminal: Minute Order

04/08/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

03/19/2019: Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

03/19/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/26/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/19/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/14/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/18/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice of Bail Forfeiture

01/16/2019: Notice of Bail Forfeiture

Criminal: Minute Order

01/15/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/17/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/26/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/07/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/31/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Bail Bond

10/23/2018: Bail Bond

Criminal: Minute Order

10/18/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/16/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 04/08/2019; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 2 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 2 Days; Comment: Count 2 misdemeanor (Credit for time served).; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 04/08/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 04/07/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 04/08/2019; Programs; DUI: 3 Month Class; Ordered; Party: Fernandez, Nadine Ann; Order Date: 04/08/2019; Fee Totals; $2,170.00; $114.53; Fee Totals; $2,284.53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(a): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 003; VC12500(a): Unlawful to Drive Unless Licensed; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • FinancialFernandez, Nadine Ann; Transaction Assessment; $2284.53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMisdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Fernandez, Nadine Ann; Deputy Public Defender: Samrao, Ramnik S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Samrao, Ramnik S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Bacciarini, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Fernandez, Nadine Ann; Deputy Public Defender: Samrao, Ramnik S

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketCitation: Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Mewhinney, Douglas V.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Fernandez, Nadine Ann; Charge #: 003; Description: VC12500(a): Unlawful to Drive Unless Licensed; Statute: 12500(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Fernandez, Nadine Ann; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Fernandez, Nadine Ann; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23152(a): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Loethen, Christopher Paul

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samrao, Ramnik S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berger, Richard