This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/19/2020 at 17:28:48 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Michelle Vega, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Michelle Vega, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schechter, Jeanne and Kirihara, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******230B

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schechter, Jeanne

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Vega, Michelle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Sandhaus, David

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

Richter, Jonathan J

Foster, Douglas

McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

03/12/2019: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

03/15/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/08/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

04/08/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/06/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Proof

05/06/2019: Proof

Criminal: Minute Order

05/13/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC10801: Own/Etc Chop Shop; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; PC496d: Receiving A Stolen Vehicle, Trailer, Construction Equipment, Or Vessel; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 003; PC496d: Receiving A Stolen Vehicle, Trailer, Construction Equipment, Or Vessel; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 004; PC594(a): Vandalism; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 005; PC594(a): Vandalism; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 006; HS11378: Controlled Substance - Possession For Sale; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Drexel, Scott Gregory; Defendant: Vega, Michelle; Contract Public Defender: Richter, Jonathan J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Drexel, Scott Gregory; Defendant: Vega, Michelle; Contract Public Defender: Richter, Jonathan J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Sandhaus, David; Defendant: Vega, Michelle; Contract Public Defender: Richter, Jonathan J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Sandhaus, David; Defendant: Vega, Michelle; Contract Public Defender: Richter, Jonathan J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Sandhaus, David; Defendant: Vega, Michelle; Contract Public Defender: Richter, Jonathan J

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Vega, Michelle; Contract Public Defender: Foster, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Vega, Michelle; Charge #: 007; Description: PC496d(a): Buy/Receive Stolen Vehicle/Equipment; Statute: 496d(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Vega, Michelle; Charge #: 006; Description: HS11378: Controlled Substance - Possession For Sale; Statute: 11378; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Vega, Michelle; Charge #: 005; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Vega, Michelle; Charge #: 004; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Vega, Michelle; Charge #: 003; Description: PC496d: Receiving A Stolen Vehicle, Trailer, Construction Equipment, Or Vessel; Statute: 496d; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Vega, Michelle; Charge #: 002; Description: PC496d: Receiving A Stolen Vehicle, Trailer, Construction Equipment, Or Vessel; Statute: 496d; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Vega, Michelle; Charge #: 001; Description: VC10801: Own/Etc Chop Shop; Statute: 10801; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sandhaus, David

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Drexel, Scott Gregory

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Egan, Gerad Denis