This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/01/2020 at 19:01:43 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Michael Kelly Cheek, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Michael Kelly Cheek, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Jacobs, Harry, Shaver, Donald and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3783

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Jacobs, Harry

Shaver, Donald

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Cheek, Michael Kelly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McAfee, Michael

Rosenthal, Sara R

Defendant Attorneys

Freitas, Wade

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Documents Received (Proof)

03/29/2019: Documents Received (Proof)

Criminal: Minute Order

03/29/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Documents Received (Proof)

03/08/2019: Documents Received (Proof)

Criminal: Minute Order

03/08/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/28/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/29/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/30/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/28/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/18/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing

11/15/2017: Notice of Hearing

Criminal: Minute Order

07/27/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

06/30/2017: Release Order

Minute Order - Printed copy with signature

06/30/2017: Minute Order - Printed copy with signature

Firearm and Ammunition Prohibition Advisement

06/30/2017: Firearm and Ammunition Prohibition Advisement

* Public *

06/30/2017: * Public *

Criminal: Minute Order

06/30/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/28/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

06/27/2017: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocuments Received (Proof)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Cheek, Michael Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocuments Received (Proof)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Cheek, Michael Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • FinancialCheek, Michael Kelly; Counter Payment; Receipt # CRIM-2019-00530; Cheek, Michael Kelly; $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • FinancialCheek, Michael Kelly; Transaction Assessment; $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Cheek, Michael Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Cheek, Michael Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMisdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McAfee, Michael; Defendant: Cheek, Michael Kelly; Deputy Public Defender: Freitas, Wade

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Cheek, Michael Kelly; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Cheek, Michael Kelly; Charge #: 001; Description: PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McAfee, Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenthal, Sara R