This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/18/2022 at 11:30:15 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Matthew Thomas Bollinger, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Matthew Thomas Bollinger, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ash, Carol, Hollman, James and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6306

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ash, Carol

Hollman, James

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Bollinger, Matthew Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosenthal, Sara R

Gates, Kathryn

Wilson, Anthony T.

Defendant Attorneys

Carasso, Alexander Louis

Mclean, Todd Eugene

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

12/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

12/29/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/07/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/10/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Amended Criminal: Minute Order dated 1/10/22

01/10/2022: Amended Criminal: Minute Order dated 1/10/22

Other Documents Not Listed

01/26/2022: Other Documents Not Listed

Criminal: Minute Order

01/27/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/02/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/24/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/03/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

03/03/2022: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Abstract of Judgment

03/08/2022: Abstract of Judgment

Collection Statement

03/10/2022: Collection Statement

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • FinancialBollinger, Matthew Thomas; CDCR - State Prison Credit; $900.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCourt Collections Follow-up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DispositionPrison; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC496(a): Buy/Receive Stolen Property; Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 03/03/2022; Concurrent: to case 21cr-06307; Term Type: Middle; Term: 3 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 67 Days; Conduct Credit: 66 Days; Comment: count 2- felony; Condition - Adult; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; $900.00; Fee Totals; $970.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC2800.2: Evade Peace Officer Reckless Driving; Dismissed with a Harvey Waiver; Charge Number: 002; PC496(a): Buy/Receive Stolen Property; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 003; PC594(a): Vandalism; Dismissed with a Harvey Waiver; Charge Number: 001; California Rule of Court-rule 4.421: Factors In Aggravation; Stricken; Charge Number: 002; California Rule of Court-rule 4.421: Factors In Aggravation; Stricken; Charge Number: 003; California Rule of Court-rule 4.421: Factors In Aggravation; Stricken

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC496(a): Buy/Receive Stolen Property; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • FinancialBollinger, Matthew Thomas; Transaction Assessment; $970.00

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Wilson, Anthony T.; Defendant: Bollinger, Matthew Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Bollinger, Matthew Thomas; Deputy Public Defender: Carasso, Alexander Louis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Bollinger, Matthew Thomas; Charge #: 003; Description: California Rule of Court-rule 4.421: Factors In Aggravation; Statute: CRC4.421; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Bollinger, Matthew Thomas; Charge #: 003; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Bollinger, Matthew Thomas; Charge #: 002; Description: California Rule of Court-rule 4.421: Factors In Aggravation; Statute: CRC4.421; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Bollinger, Matthew Thomas; Charge #: 002; Description: PC496(a): Buy/Receive Stolen Property; Statute: 496(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Bollinger, Matthew Thomas; Charge #: 001; Description: California Rule of Court-rule 4.421: Factors In Aggravation; Statute: CRC4.421; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Bollinger, Matthew Thomas; Charge #: 001; Description: VC2800.2: Evade Peace Officer Reckless Driving; Statute: 2800.2; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carasso, Alexander

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene