This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/25/2020 at 20:38:55 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Matthew Levi Brummett, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Matthew Levi Brummett, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hollman, James and Ash, Carol. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6762

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hollman, James

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Brummett, Matthew Levi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Margain, Andre Carlos

Madayag, Kimberly

Min, Thomas K

Defendant Attorneys

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Noguera, Michael Anthony

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

12/30/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

12/30/2019: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/06/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Fingerprint Card

01/06/2020: Fingerprint Card

Evaluation Request

01/08/2020: Evaluation Request

Criminal: Minute Order

02/10/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

02/10/2020: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Notice

03/05/2020: Notice

Request

03/06/2020: Request

Criminal: Minute Order

03/09/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Original Type: Report Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Original Type: Doctor Report: PC1369/PC1370; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Margain, Andre Carlos; Defendant: Brummett, Matthew Levi; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1368; Original Type: Doctor Report: PC1368; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Brummett, Matthew Levi; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvaluation Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFingerprint Card; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Brummett, Matthew Levi; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied; Charge Number: 001; PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Madayag, Kimberly; Defendant: Brummett, Matthew Levi; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/25/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Brummett, Matthew Levi; Charge #: 002; Description: PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/25/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Brummett, Matthew Levi; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(a)(1): Prior Serious Felony (ENHANCEMENT-SPEC ALLEG); Statute: 667(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/25/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Brummett, Matthew Levi; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/25/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Brummett, Matthew Levi; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene