This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/20/2020 at 12:52:04 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Matthew Arthur Souza, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Matthew Arthur Souza, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Shaver, Donald and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1912

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Shaver, Donald

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Souza, Matthew Arthur

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heil, Austin Brooke

Compton, Misty

Defendant Attorneys

Rhodes, Leanna M

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Release Order

04/26/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/26/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/19/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

04/15/2019: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

04/15/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DispositionSentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Start Date: 04/26/2019; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 23 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 23 Days; Comment: Count 1 Misdemeanor Credit Time Served; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 04/26/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 04/25/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 04/26/2019; Fee Totals; $220.00; Fee Totals; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 002; HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • FinancialSouza, Matthew Arthur; Transaction Assessment; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Souza, Matthew Arthur; Contract Public Defender: Rhodes, Leanna M; Contract Public Defender: Rhodes, Leanna M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Heil, Austin Brooke; Defendant: Souza, Matthew Arthur; Contract Public Defender: Rhodes, Leanna M; Contract Public Defender: Rhodes, Leanna M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Souza, Matthew Arthur; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Souza, Matthew Arthur; Charge #: 002; Description: HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Souza, Matthew Arthur; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rhodes, Leanna M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent