This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/10/2020 at 12:02:13 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Martin Reyna Acosta, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/15/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Martin Reyna Acosta, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Nakahara, Vernon K., Lo, Paul, Schechter, Jeanne, Mewhinney, Douglas V. and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4281

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Nakahara, Vernon K.

Lo, Paul

Schechter, Jeanne

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Acosta, Martin Reyna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosenthal, Sara R

Min, Thomas Keynes

McKean, Tyler

Bakich, Donna

Compton, Misty

Defendant Attorneys

Green, Anthony C

Noguera, Michael Anthony

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Probation Violation

01/17/2020: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

01/17/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

11/08/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/08/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/24/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

10/18/2019: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Collection Statement

11/26/2018: Collection Statement

Order

10/30/2018: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/30/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/16/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/09/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Motion

10/04/2018: Motion

Probation Orders

09/27/2018: Probation Orders

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

09/27/2018: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

09/27/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

08/24/2018: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Criminal: Minute Order

08/24/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/17/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Probation; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 09/27/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 10/11/2021; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/27/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/24/2019; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 11/08/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 01/17/2020; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 01/17/2020; Consecutive: VOP #1; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 30 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 4 Days; Conduct Credit: 4 Days; Comment: VOP #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 003; VOP #2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 003; VOP #2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Acosta, Martin Reyna; Charge #: 003; Description: VOP #2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Probation Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: VOP - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Acosta, Martin Reyna; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DispositionSentence; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VOP # 1 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 11/08/2019; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 60 Days; Suspended: 57 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 3 Days; Comment: Credit for time served.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Probation; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 09/27/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 10/11/2021; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/27/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/24/2019; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VOP # 1 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VOP # 1 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketFingerprint Card; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Acosta, Martin Reyna; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketPretrial Electronic Monitoring Program Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McKean, Tyler; Defendant: Acosta, Martin Reyna; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Acosta, Martin Reyna; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Acosta, Martin Reyna; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Anthony Charles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent