This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/10/2020 at 01:22:41 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Mark Harry Kockos, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Mark Harry Kockos, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Shaver, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4272

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Shaver, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Kockos, Mark Harry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Asdorian, Blake M

Defendant Attorney

Noguera, Michael Anthony

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/15/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/13/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

08/14/2018: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Complaint

08/09/2018: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Dism: PC1385-Furtherance of Justice; Charge Number: 002; HS11364: Possession Of Injection/Ingestion Device; Dism: PC1385-Furtherance of Justice; Charge Number: 003; VC5200(a): License Plate Display Specified (POC); Dism: PC1385-Furtherance of Justice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Noguera, Michael Anthony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Kockos, Mark Harry; Charge #: 003; Description: VC5200(a): License Plate Display Specified (POC); Statute: 5200(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Kockos, Mark Harry; Charge #: 002; Description: HS11364: Possession Of Injection/Ingestion Device; Statute: 11364; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Kockos, Mark Harry; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11377: Possession of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less