This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 18:01:47 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Manuel Sandoval Orozco, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Manuel Sandoval Orozco, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4812

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Orozco, Manuel Sandoval

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Min, Thomas K

Defendant Attorneys

Mclean, Todd Eugene

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/01/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

10/04/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/07/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/14/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/21/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/22/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/03/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

11/03/2021: Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Minute Order - Printed copy with signature

11/03/2021: Minute Order - Printed copy with signature

Release Order

11/03/2021: Release Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 11/03/2021; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 2 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 2 Days; Comment: Count 2 Misdemeanor; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 11/03/2021; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 11/02/2024; Status; Status: Active; Date: 11/03/2021; Programs; DUI: 3 Month Class; Ordered; Party: Orozco, Manuel Sandoval; Order Date: 11/03/2021; Enroll by Date: 12/03/2021; Fee Totals; $2,128.00; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $2,198.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; VC23152(a): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialOrozco, Manuel Sandoval; Transaction Assessment; $2198.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDefense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketConviction Certified by Clerk of the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCourt Found Plea Knowledgeable; Intelligently Made Voluntary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketRight to Confront And Cross Examine Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Orozco, Manuel Sandoval; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Orozco, Manuel Sandoval; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Orozco, Manuel Sandoval; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Orozco, Manuel Sandoval; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Orozco, Manuel Sandoval

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Orozco, Manuel Sandoval; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Orozco, Manuel Sandoval; Charge #: 002; Description: VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Orozco, Manuel Sandoval; Charge #: 001; Description: VC23152(a): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene