This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 18:01:08 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Manuel Martinez, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Manuel Martinez, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5649

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Martinez, Manuel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Nored, Thane

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Castleton, Jeffrey C

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

11/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint

Declaration

12/01/2021: Declaration

Criminal: Minute Order

12/08/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Declaration

12/09/2021: Declaration

Criminal: Minute Order

01/06/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: TBA, Judge; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Martinez, Manuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC187(a): Killing of Human Being w/Malice Aforethought; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC12022.53(d): F/Arm:GBI:Com/F; Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Martinez, Manuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Serratto, Matthew Travers; Defendant: Martinez, Manuel; Deputy District Attorney: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Manuel; Charge #: 003; Description: PC30305(a)(1): Person Prohibited In Possession Of Ammunition; Statute: 30305(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Manuel; Charge #: 002; Description: PC29800(a)(1): Felon In Possession Of Firearm; Statute: 29800(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Manuel; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022.53(d): F/Arm:GBI:Com/F; Statute: 12022.53(d); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • ChargeCharges: Martinez, Manuel; Charge #: 001; Description: PC187(a): Killing of Human Being w/Malice Aforethought; Statute: 187(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Castleton, Jeffrey C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent