Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/26/2020 at 13:00:14 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Manuel Chon Parga, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/16/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Manuel Chon Parga, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mewhinney, Douglas V., Hollman, James, Kirihara, John, Breen, Thomas P., Jacobs, Harry, Hansen, Ronald and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5407

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Hollman, James

Kirihara, John

Breen, Thomas P.

Jacobs, Harry

Hansen, Ronald

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Parga, Manuel Chon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Margain, Andre Carlos

Creeger, Matthew L

Sandhaus, David

Compton, Misty

Min, Thomas K

Egan, Gerad Denis

Lee, Beth A

Andrade, Vincent

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

Green, Anthony C

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/31/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/17/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/06/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/08/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/25/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/20/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

09/09/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/23/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/26/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/07/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/08/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

04/03/2019: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

03/08/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/20/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

12/19/2017: Affidavit of Probation Violation

* Public *

05/16/2017: * Public *

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketDrug Court Review; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketDrug Court Review; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order #2020-04 Notice of Hearing Change (COVID-19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order #2020-04 Notice of Hearing Change (COVID-19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStanding Order #2020-04 Notice of Hearing Change (COVID-19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDrug Court Review; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order

    Read MoreRead Less
130 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Parga, Manuel Chon; Contract Public Defender: Margain, Andre Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Parga, Manuel Chon; Contract Public Defender: Margain, Andre Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Parga, Manuel Chon; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Parga, Manuel Chon; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berger, Richard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Anthony Charles

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margain, Andre Carlos