Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/25/2020 at 02:40:05 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Manuel Anthony Ontiveros, Junior, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 06/21/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Manuel Anthony Ontiveros, Junior, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schechter, Jeanne, Lo, Paul, McNatt, Bobby W., Jacobs, Harry and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******033A

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schechter, Jeanne

Lo, Paul

McNatt, Bobby W.

Jacobs, Harry

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ontiveros, Manuel, Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Drexel, Scott Gregory

Compton, Misty

Martinez, Mathew Joseph

Sandhaus, David

Creeger, Matthew L

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Defendant Attorneys

Herman, George H, III

Andrade, Vincent

Kelsey, Eloise E

Green, Anthony C

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

02/20/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/08/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Violation of Mandatory Supervision

12/28/2017: Affidavit of Violation of Mandatory Supervision

Release Order

12/11/2017: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/11/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Violation of Mandatory Supervision

12/08/2017: Affidavit of Violation of Mandatory Supervision

Criminal: Minute Order

10/10/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/29/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Violation of Mandatory Supervision

09/26/2017: Affidavit of Violation of Mandatory Supervision

Abstract of Judgment

10/11/2016: Abstract of Judgment

Notice

10/05/2016: Notice

Abstract of Judgment

09/02/2016: Abstract of Judgment

* Public *

09/02/2016: * Public *

* Public *

09/02/2016: * Public *

Information

08/18/2016: Information

Complaint

06/21/2016: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; **PC594(a): Vandalism; Probation; Probation; Type: Mandatory Supervision; Start Date: 09/02/2016; Term: 1 Year; End Date: 09/01/2018; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/02/2016; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 10/10/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 01/08/2018; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 02/20/2018; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 02/20/2018; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 60 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 5 Days; Conduct Credit: 4 Days; Comment: Violation of Mandatory Community Supervision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 0014; VOP#3PC1170(h)(5)(b): Revocation of Mandatory Supervision; VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 0014; VOP#3PC1170(h)(5)(b): Revocation of Mandatory Supervision; Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Serratto, Matthew Travers; Defendant: Ontiveros, Manuel, Junior; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; **PC594(a): Vandalism; Probation; Probation; Type: Mandatory Supervision; Start Date: 09/02/2016; Term: 1 Year; End Date: 09/01/2018; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/02/2016; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 10/10/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Mandatory Community Supervision; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Ontiveros, Manuel, Junior; Charge #: 0014; Description: VOP#3PC1170(h)(5)(b): Revocation of Mandatory Supervision; Statute: 1170(h)(5)(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Violation of Mandatory Supervision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DispositionAmended Sentence; Charges; Charge Number: 003; **VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 12/11/2017; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 12 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 6 Days; Conduct Credit: 6 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Ontiveros, Manuel, Junior; Charge #: 006; Description: PC602(m): Trespass:Occupy Property Without Consent; Statute: 602(m); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Ontiveros, Manuel, Junior; Charge #: 005; Description: VC23103(a): Reckless Driving; Statute: 23103(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Ontiveros, Manuel, Junior; Charge #: 005; Description: **PC602(m): Trespass:Occupy Property Without Consent; Statute: 602(m); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Ontiveros, Manuel, Junior; Charge #: 004; Description: **VC23103(a): Reckless Driving; Statute: 23103(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Ontiveros, Manuel, Junior; Charge #: 004; Description: VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Ontiveros, Manuel, Junior; Charge #: 003; Description: VC23152(a): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Ontiveros, Manuel, Junior; Charge #: 003; Description: **VC23152(b): Driving Under Influence with 0.08% or more by weight of alcohol in blood; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Ontiveros, Manuel, Junior; Charge #: 002; Description: **VC23152(a): Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Ontiveros, Manuel, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Ontiveros, Manuel, Junior; Charge #: 001; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism-Minor; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sandhaus, David

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Drexel, Scott Gregory

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINEZ, MATHEW JOSEPH