This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/22/2021 at 17:01:53 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Luis Alberto CamachoDiaz, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Luis Alberto CamachoDiaz, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald, Lo, Paul, Ash, Carol and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5654

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Lo, Paul

Ash, Carol

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

CamachoDiaz, Luis Alberto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Asdorian, Blake M.

Newman, Jeffrey Samuel

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Carasso, Alexander Louis

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

11/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

11/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint

Release Order

11/24/2021: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order (2nd Amended)

11/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order (2nd Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

12/15/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Motion

12/15/2021: Motion

Criminal: Minute Order

12/17/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; Original Type: Request; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Serratto, Matthew Travers; Defendant: CamachoDiaz, Luis Alberto; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • ChargeCharges: CamachoDiaz, Luis Alberto; Charge #: 001; Description: PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carasso, Alexander

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent