This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/19/2020 at 17:28:20 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Lucio Maldonado, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Lucio Maldonado, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald, Kirihara, John and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1223

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Kirihara, John

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Maldonado, Lucio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Compton, Misty

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

03/12/2019: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

03/18/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/25/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • FinancialMaldonado, Lucio; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketMonthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DispositionProbation; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC417(a)(1): Exhibit Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 03/25/2019; Consecutive: 16CR-05201; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 30 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 10 Days; Conduct Credit: 10 Days; Comment: Count 2, misdemeanor; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 03/25/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 03/24/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 03/25/2019; Fee Totals; $40.00; $30.00; $150.00; Fee Totals; $220.00; Comment; Comment: ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC242: Battery; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; PC417(a)(1): Exhibit Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC417(a)(1): Exhibit Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • FinancialMaldonado, Lucio; Transaction Assessment; $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Maldonado, Lucio; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Maldonado, Lucio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 003; PC245(c): Assault With Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC242: Battery; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC417(a)(1): Exhibit Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Maldonado, Lucio; Deputy Public Defender: McInally, Nicholas Bernard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Maldonado, Lucio; Charge #: 003; Description: PC245(c): Assault With Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(c); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Maldonado, Lucio; Charge #: 002; Description: PC417(a)(1): Exhibit Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 417(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Maldonado, Lucio; Charge #: 001; Description: PC242: Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McMillan, Matthew Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent