Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/16/2020 at 14:29:11 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Linda Hosey, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Linda Hosey, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hashimoto, Roy, Schechter, Jeanne, Shaver, Donald, Ash, Carol, Slocum, Steven and Stewart, Melinda. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2996

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hashimoto, Roy

Schechter, Jeanne

Shaver, Donald

Ash, Carol

Slocum, Steven

Stewart, Melinda

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendants

Hosey, Linda Michelle

Hosey, Linda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Pfeiff, Thomas M

Rosenthal, Sara R

Asdorian, Blake M

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

Samrao, Ramnik S

Freitas, Wade

Chu, Erica Joy Galeon

McInally, Nicholas Bernard

Andrade, Vincent

Page, Kathleen Coleen

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

02/24/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/13/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/04/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/27/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Bail Bond

08/29/2019: Bail Bond

Criminal: Minute Order

06/07/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/04/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/01/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/20/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/12/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/26/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Order

04/22/2016: Order

Other Documents Not Listed

04/15/2016: Other Documents Not Listed

Notice

03/25/2016: Notice

Notice

11/09/2015: Notice

Complaint

07/07/2015: Complaint

Motion

05/22/2019: Motion

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11364.1(a)(1): Possession of Smoking Device; Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketBail Bond Exonerated; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Pfeiff, Thomas M; Defendant: Hosey, Linda Michelle; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Asdorian, Blake M; Defendant: Hosey, Linda Michelle; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Hosey, Linda Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketBail Bond Booking Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketBond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketGeneral Time Waived; Judicial Officer: Stewart, Melinda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Stewart, Melinda; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Hosey, Linda Michelle; Deputy Public Defender: Samrao, Ramnik S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11364.1(a)(1): Possession of Smoking Device; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketTime Not Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketArraigned: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Hosey, Linda Michelle; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Hosey, Linda Michelle; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11364.1(a)(1): Possession of Smoking Device; Statute: HS113364.1(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenthal, Sara R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Egan, Gerad Denis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nored, Thane