This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 18:00:42 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Leonel Ocampo, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Leonel Ocampo, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, Ash, Carol and Kirihara, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4806

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Ash, Carol

Kirihara, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ocampo, Leonel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Silveira, Nicole A.

Lozano, Angelica

Defendant Attorneys

Reed, Katharine

Mohaghegh-Yazdi, Eli T.

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

10/01/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

10/01/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

10/07/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/13/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/18/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/16/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/22/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Lozano, Angelica; Defendant: Ocampo, Leonel; Retained: Mohaghegh-Yazdi, Eli T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Lozano, Angelica; Defendant: Ocampo, Leonel; Retained: Mohaghegh-Yazdi, Eli T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Lozano, Angelica; Defendant: Ocampo, Leonel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Lozano, Angelica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Lozano, Angelica; Defendant: Ocampo, Leonel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Ocampo, Leonel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Ocampo, Leonel; Charge #: 003; Description: PC1203.066(a)(7): Ineligible for Prob-Convtd of Lewd Act w/Chil; Statute: 1203.066(a)(7); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Ocampo, Leonel; Charge #: 003; Description: PC288(a): Lewd Or Lascivious Act-Under 14 Years; Statute: 288(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Ocampo, Leonel; Charge #: 002; Description: PC1203.066(a)(7): Ineligible for Prob-Convtd of Lewd Act w/Chil; Statute: 1203.066(a)(7); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Ocampo, Leonel; Charge #: 002; Description: PC288(a): Lewd Or Lascivious Act-Under 14 Years; Statute: 288(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Ocampo, Leonel; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1203.066(a)(7): Ineligible for Prob-Convtd of Lewd Act w/Chil; Statute: 1203.066(a)(7); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Ocampo, Leonel; Charge #: 001; Description: PC288(a): Lewd Or Lascivious Act-Under 14 Years; Statute: 288(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed, Katharine