This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/26/2020 at 23:42:16 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Lawrence Waters, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/20/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Lawrence Waters, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schechter, Jeanne, McNatt, Bobby W., Shaver, Donald, Moranda, David, Bacciarini, Mark, Jacobs, Harry, Slocum, Steven, Dougherty, Frank and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3506

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schechter, Jeanne

McNatt, Bobby W.

Shaver, Donald

Moranda, David

Bacciarini, Mark

Jacobs, Harry

Slocum, Steven

Dougherty, Frank

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Waters, Lawrence Edwards

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mckinney, Michael C

Nored, Thane

McAfee, Michael

Martinez, Mathew Joseph

Compton, Misty

Min, Thomas K

Wall, Walter W.

Defendant Attorneys

McMillan, Matthew Scott

Howard, Sean

Meyer, Derek Scott

Andrade, Vincent

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

12/10/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/27/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

11/26/2018: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

11/26/2018: CR Criminal Courtesy Notice

Criminal: Minute Order

11/09/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/12/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/24/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/12/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

* Public *

09/20/2016: * Public *

Bail Bond

09/06/2016: Bail Bond

Returned Mail

07/18/2016: Returned Mail

Proof of Service

07/12/2016: Proof of Service

Notice

07/05/2016: Notice

Information

06/08/2016: Information

Complaint

05/25/2016: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DispositionAmended Sentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC243(e)(1): Battery On A Non-Cohabitating Partner; Sentence; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 09/20/2016; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 09/20/2019; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/20/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/26/2016; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 12/19/2016; Comment: With same terms; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 09/24/2018; Status; Status: Terminated; Date: 12/10/2018; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 12/10/2018; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 3 Months; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 0 Day; Comment: Count 1 Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 003; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 003; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketReport Credit/Fines; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: VOP; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Waters, Lawrence Edwards; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: VOP; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Waters, Lawrence Edwards; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Warrant - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Waters, Lawrence Edwards; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourtesy Notice - Notice to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCitation: Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: McNatt, Bobby W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: McNatt, Bobby W.; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Mckinney, Michael C; Defendant: Waters, Lawrence Edwards; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Waters, Lawrence Edwards; Charge #: 003; Description: PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Waters, Lawrence Edwards; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC667.5(b): W/Pr Prison:Othr Than 667.5(A) (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 667.5(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Waters, Lawrence Edwards; Charge #: 001; Description: **PC1170.12: Prior Strike (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Waters, Lawrence Edwards; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1170.12: Prior Strike (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Waters, Lawrence Edwards; Charge #: 001; Description: PC243(e)(1): Battery On A Non-Cohabitating Partner; Statute: PC243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Waters, Lawrence Edwards; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McMillan, Matthew Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard, Sean

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meyer, Derek Scott