Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 18:05:45 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Keythan Michael JonesSlaise, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Keythan Michael JonesSlaise, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shaver, Donald and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1887

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shaver, Donald

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Jonesslaise, Keythan Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nored, Thane

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

05/28/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/20/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

05/17/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC148.9(a): False Identification To Peace Officer; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; VC12500(a): Unlawful to Drive Unless Licensed; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 003; VC22350: Unsafe Speed-Prevailing Conditions (TSE); Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 004; VC16028(a): Fail to Provide Evid Financial Responsibility (POI); Dism: Motion of the People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: JonesSlaise, Keythan Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • ChargeCharges: JonesSlaise, Keythan Michael; Charge #: 004; Description: VC16028(a): Fail to Provide Evid Financial Responsibility (POI); Statute: 16028(a); Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • ChargeCharges: JonesSlaise, Keythan Michael; Charge #: 003; Description: VC22350: Unsafe Speed-Prevailing Conditions (TSE); Statute: 22350; Level: Infraction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • ChargeCharges: JonesSlaise, Keythan Michael; Charge #: 002; Description: VC12500(a): Unlawful to Drive Unless Licensed; Statute: 12500(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • ChargeCharges: JonesSlaise, Keythan Michael; Charge #: 001; Description: PC148.9(a): False Identification To Peace Officer; Statute: 148.9(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nored, Thane