This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 18:01:50 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Kevin Dewayne McCartney, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Kevin Dewayne McCartney, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Slocum, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4872

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Slocum, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

McCartney, Kevin Dewayne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Creeger, Matthew

Keller, Maureen Ann

Boyer, Kayla A

Defendant Attorneys

Hutson, Tina

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Foster, Douglas

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/05/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

10/06/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Request

10/12/2021: Request

Criminal: Minute Order

10/13/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

10/13/2021: Release Order

Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form for DEJ cases

10/13/2021: Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form for DEJ cases

Criminal: Minute Order

11/17/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketProof; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketProof; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof; Original Type: Proof; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Boyer, Kayla A; Defendant; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketProof; Original Type: Proof; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DispositionDeferred Entry of Judgment; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Unauthorized Possession; Deferred Entry of Judgment; Charge Number: 001; PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Deferred Entry of Judgment; Programs; Deferred Entry of Judgment; Ordered; AA/NA Meetings; Ordered; Party: McCartney, Kevin Dewayne; Order Date: 10/13/2021; Enroll by Date: 11/13/2021; Duration: 12 Months; Comment: PC1000(c); Party: McCartney, Kevin Dewayne; Order Date: 10/13/2021; Enroll by Date: 11/13/2021; Comment: 1 per week

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Unauthorized Possession; Deferred Entry of Judgment; Charge Number: 001; PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Deferred Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Unauthorized Possession; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdvisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form for DEJ cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Keller, Maureen Ann; Defendant: McCartney, Kevin Dewayne; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; HS11377: Unauthorized Possession; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew; Defendant: McCartney, Kevin Dewayne; Contract Public Defender: Hutson, Tina

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • ChargeCharges: McCartney, Kevin Dewayne; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1170.12: Strike Prior; Statute: 1170.12; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • ChargeCharges: McCartney, Kevin Dewayne; Charge #: 001; Description: HS11377: Unauthorized Possession; Statute: 11377; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hutson, Tina

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foster, Douglas