This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 08/28/2021 at 18:01:00 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Kenney Russell Pearson, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Kenney Russell Pearson, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hansen, Ronald and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2662

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hansen, Ronald

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Pearson, Kenney Russell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Silveira, Nicole A.

Compton, Misty

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Partin, Lauri L

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

08/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/10/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

07/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

07/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/06/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

06/29/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

06/29/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Pearson, Kenney Russell; Deputy Public Defender: Partin, Lauri L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Pearson, Kenney Russell; Deputy Public Defender: Partin, Lauri L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Pearson, Kenney Russell; Deputy Public Defender: Partin, Lauri L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC451(c): Arson: Structure/Forest Land; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Pearson, Kenney Russell; Deputy Public Defender: Partin, Lauri L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Pearson, Kenney Russell; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Pearson, Kenney Russell; Charge #: 001; Description: PC451(c): Arson: Structure/Forest Land; Statute: 451(c); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Partin, Lauri L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent