This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 17:01:41 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Katherine Elizabeth Love, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Katherine Elizabeth Love, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Kirihara, John and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0-RF

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Kirihara, John

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Love, Katherine Elizabeth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Silveira, Nicole A.

Creeger, Matthew L

Defendant Attorneys

Sok, Curtis B

Foster, Douglas

 

Court Documents

Bail Bond

06/29/2021: Bail Bond

Request

07/08/2021: Request

Notice of Hearing

08/18/2021: Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

08/18/2021: Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

08/18/2021: Notice of Hearing

Complaint: PC1387.2

08/30/2021: Complaint: PC1387.2

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint: PC1387.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketModification; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketOrder: Request for Hearing on Protective Order Modification; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Booking Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Love, Katherine Elizabeth; Charge #: 002; Description: PC273A(a): Child Abuse; Statute: 273A(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Love, Katherine Elizabeth; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(1): Assault:Deadly Weapon Other Than Firearm; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foster, Douglas