This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 18:03:17 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Katelyn Marie Anthenien, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Katelyn Marie Anthenien, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******595B

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Anthenien, Katelyn Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Silveira, Nicole A.

Gates, Kathryn

Defendant Attorneys

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Foster, Douglas

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/22/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

09/23/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/27/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Request

10/12/2021: Request

Criminal: Minute Order

10/13/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/10/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/12/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Defendant: Anthenien, Katelyn Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Anthenien, Katelyn Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Silveira, Nicole A.; Defendant: Anthenien, Katelyn Marie; Contract Public Defender: Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC4573.5: Bring Drugs/Alcohol Into Penal Institution; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied; Charge Number: 001; PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC4573(a) : Bringing Contraband into the Jail; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Anthenien, Katelyn Marie; Contract Public Defender: Foster, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Anthenien, Katelyn Marie; Charge #: 002; Description: PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 1203(e)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Anthenien, Katelyn Marie; Charge #: 002; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Anthenien, Katelyn Marie; Charge #: 002; Description: PC4573(a) : Bringing Contraband into the Jail; Statute: 4573(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Anthenien, Katelyn Marie; Charge #: 001; Description: PC1203(e)(4): W/Pr Fel Conv (ENHANCEMENT); Statute: 1203(e)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Anthenien, Katelyn Marie; Charge #: 001; Description: PC667(b)-(i): W/Pr Fel Conv:Serious/Violent Felony; Statute: 667(b)-(i); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Anthenien, Katelyn Marie; Charge #: 001; Description: PC4573.5: Bring Drugs/Alcohol Into Penal Institution; Statute: 4573.5; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foster, Douglas