This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/15/2022 at 18:02:00 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Kate Louise Borba, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Kate Louise Borba, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, Ash, Carol and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******033B

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Ash, Carol

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Borba, Kate Louise

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

Foster, Douglas

Siegel, Mark Lloyd

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/04/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

01/04/2022: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

01/10/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

01/10/2022: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/19/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/03/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/28/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketWarrant: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Original Type: Preliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant; Contract Public Defender: Siegel, Mark Lloyd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Borba, Kate Louise; Contract Public Defender: Siegel, Mark Lloyd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Borba, Kate Louise; Contract Public Defender: Siegel, Mark Lloyd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Borba, Kate Louise; Contract Public Defender: Siegel, Mark Lloyd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC459: Burglary; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Borba, Kate Louise; Contract Public Defender: Foster, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Borba, Kate Louise; Charge #: 001; Description: PC459: Burglary; Statute: 459; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Siegel, Mark Lloyd

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foster, Douglas