This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/23/2021 at 18:06:10 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Justin Ray Villanueva, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Justin Ray Villanueva, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirihara, John and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1040

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirihara, John

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Villanueva, Justin Ray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Attwell, Joseph Evans

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Jamieson, Stephanie L

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

03/24/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

03/26/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Bail Bond

03/26/2021: Bail Bond

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Booking Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBail Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Attwell, Joseph Evans; Defendant: Villanueva, Justin Ray; Deputy Public Defender: Jamieson, Stephanie L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Villanueva, Justin Ray; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Villanueva, Justin Ray; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamieson, Stephanie L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent