This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 02/07/2022 at 18:04:14 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Justin Michael Lee, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Justin Michael Lee, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven, Ash, Carol and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5871

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Ash, Carol

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Lee, Justin Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Roland, Tracy Marie

Egan, Gerad Denis

Defendant Attorneys

Carasso, Alexander Louis

Mclean, Todd Eugene

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

02/03/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Motion

02/01/2022: Motion

Returned Mail

01/28/2022: Returned Mail

Collection Statement

01/28/2022: Collection Statement

Probation Orders

01/26/2022: Probation Orders

Criminal: Minute Order (Supplemental)

01/26/2022: Criminal: Minute Order (Supplemental)

Criminal: Minute Order

01/26/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Other Documents Not Listed

01/20/2022: Other Documents Not Listed

Returned Mail

12/22/2021: Returned Mail

Criminal: Minute Order

01/03/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Motion

12/29/2021: Motion

Returned Mail

12/14/2021: Returned Mail

Order

12/20/2021: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/20/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing

12/16/2021: Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

12/16/2021: Notice of Hearing

Criminal: Minute Order

12/15/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

12/09/2021: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Original Type: Motion; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Lee, Justin Michael; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • FinancialLee, Justin Michael; Transaction Assessment; $710.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbation Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketProhibited Person Relinquishment Form Findings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketFirearms Relinquishment Hearing; Original Type: Firearms Relinquishment Hearing; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Original Type: Sentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Egan, Gerad Denis; Defendant: Lee, Justin Michael; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Roland, Tracy Marie; Defendant: Lee, Justin Michael; Deputy Public Defender: Carasso, Alexander Louis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lee, Justin Michael; Charge #: 004; Description: VC12500(a): Unlawful to Drive Unless Licensed; Statute: 12500(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lee, Justin Michael; Charge #: 003; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lee, Justin Michael; Charge #: 002; Description: PC496d: Receiving A Stolen Vehicle, Trailer, Construction Equipment, Or Vessel; Statute: 496d; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Lee, Justin Michael; Charge #: 001; Description: VC10851(a): Take Vehicle Without Owners Consent; Statute: 10851(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carasso, Alexander

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mclean, Todd Eugene