This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/25/2020 at 01:30:41 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Justin Lee, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 06/17/2016 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Justin Lee, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schechter, Jeanne, McNatt, Bobby W., Shaver, Donald, Kirihara, John, Ash, Carol, Lacy, Edward M., Jacobs, Harry, Baysinger, Robert F., Lo, Paul, Dougherty, Frank and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3989

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schechter, Jeanne

McNatt, Bobby W.

Shaver, Donald

Kirihara, John

Ash, Carol

Lacy, Edward M.

Jacobs, Harry

Baysinger, Robert F.

Lo, Paul

Dougherty, Frank

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Lee, Justin Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mckinney, Michael C

Nored, Thane

Hanson, Ann

Rosenthal, Sara R

McCoy, Tyson John

Compton, Misty

Serratto, Matthew Travers

McKinney, Ilia C.

Defendant Attorneys

Margain, Andre Carlos

Freitas, Wade

Meyer, Derek Scott

Lope, Armando

Andrade, Vincent

Albertoni, Susan L

Berger, Richard

 

Court Documents

Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

03/29/2019: Revised FTP Courtesy Notice

Collection Statement

12/03/2018: Collection Statement

Criminal: Minute Order

05/17/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/14/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/07/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/03/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

04/02/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/02/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/29/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/25/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

01/16/2018: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/16/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Order

02/14/2017: Order

Declaration

11/15/2016: Declaration

* Public *

06/22/2016: * Public *

Notice

06/17/2016: Notice

Complaint

06/17/2016: Complaint

Correspondence

09/25/2018: Correspondence

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFTP - 20 Day Collection Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • FinancialLee, Justin Michael; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMonthly Payment Plan Setup - $45 Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DispositionAmended Sentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC243(e)(1): Battery On A Non-Cohabitating Partner; Sentence; Probation; Type: Conditional Revocable Release; Start Date: 08/01/2016; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 02/16/2020; Status; Status: Active; Date: 08/01/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 09/12/2016; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 10/31/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 11/16/2016; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 12/20/2016; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 02/14/2017; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 02/02/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 04/02/2018; Status; Status: Reinstated; Date: 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 006; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 006; PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Lee, Justin Michael; Deputy Public Defender: Berger, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Lee, Justin Michael; Deputy Public Defender: Berger, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Baysinger, Robert F.; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC243(e)(1): Battery On A Non-Cohabitating Partner; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; HS11364(a): Unlawful to Possess Pipe or any Device; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Baysinger, Robert F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Baysinger, Robert F.; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Mckinney, Michael C; Deputy District Attorney: Mckinney, Michael C; Defendant: Lee, Justin Michael; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Lee, Justin Michael; Charge #: 002; Description: HS11364(a): Unlawful to Possess Pipe or any Device; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • ChargeCharges: Lee, Justin Michael; Charge #: 001; Description: PC243(e)(1): Battery On A Non-Cohabitating Partner; Statute: PC243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2015
  • ChargeCharges: Lee, Justin Michael; Charge #: 004; Description: PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Freitas, Wade

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Albertoni, Susan L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando