Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/05/2020 at 00:11:24 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Justin Beserra, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 11/20/2017 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Justin Beserra, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirihara, John, McNatt, Bobby W., Shaver, Donald, Mewhinney, Douglas V., Jacobs, Harry, Slocum, Steven and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7076

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirihara, John

McNatt, Bobby W.

Shaver, Donald

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Jacobs, Harry

Slocum, Steven

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Beserra, Justin David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colby, Travis

McAfee, Michael

Boyer, Kayla A

Enero, Natalia Ruth

Wall, Walter W.

Min, Thomas Keynes

Defendant Attorneys

Meyer, Derek Scott

Chu, Erica Joy Galeon

Reed, Katharine

Green, Anthony C

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

11/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Returned Mail

10/25/2019: Returned Mail

Criminal: Minute Order

10/11/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Proof

08/12/2019: Proof

Criminal: Minute Order

08/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/13/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/04/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/28/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/29/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/30/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/10/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

03/09/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

01/05/2018: Misdemeanor Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Criminal: Minute Order

01/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/04/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/22/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

11/20/2017: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

11/20/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProgress Report; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Judicial Officer: Kirihara, John; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Boyer, Kayla A; Defendant: Beserra, Justin David; Deputy Public Defender: Reed, Katharine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProgress Report; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Colby, Travis; Defendant: Beserra, Justin David; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Beserra, Justin David; Charge #: 006; Description: PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Statute: 1203.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Beserra, Justin David; Charge #: 005; Description: PC136.1(b)(1): Prevent/Dissuade Witness/Victim - Reporting; Statute: 136.1(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Beserra, Justin David; Charge #: 004; Description: PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Beserra, Justin David; Charge #: 003; Description: PC243(e)(1): Battery on Spouse or any person with whom the defendant is cohabiting with; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Beserra, Justin David; Charge #: 002; Description: PC236: False Imprisonment; Statute: 236; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Beserra, Justin David; Charge #: 001; Description: PC422(a): Criminal Threats; Statute: 422(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McAfee, Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wall, Walter W.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boyer, Kayla A