Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 03/20/2020 at 17:52:36 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Justin Allen Christensen, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Justin Allen Christensen, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bacciarini, Mark, Lo, Paul, Hollman, James and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2334

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bacciarini, Mark

Lo, Paul

Hollman, James

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Christensen, Justin Allen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Min, Thomas K

Compton, Misty

Rosenthal, Sara R

Madayag, Kimberly

Creeger, Matthew L

Gates, Kathryn

McCoy, Tyson John

Defendant Attorneys

Lee, Beth A

Andrade, Vincent

Green, Anthony C

Reed, Katharine

Noguera, Michael Anthony

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

01/17/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Release Order

01/09/2020: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

01/09/2020: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

01/09/2020: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/19/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

12/05/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/18/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/17/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/11/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

10/09/2019: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Collection Statement

07/18/2019: Collection Statement

Criminal: Minute Order

06/17/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

06/13/2019: Notice

Order

06/10/2019: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/10/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/09/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/07/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/02/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Proceedings; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant; Deputy Public Defender: Reed, Katharine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DispositionAmended Commitment; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC4573.5: Bring Drugs/Alcohol Into Penal Institution; Commitment; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 06/10/2019; Term: 36 Months; End Date: 06/10/2022; Status; Status: Active; Date: 06/10/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/11/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 01/09/2020; Fee Totals; $30.00; $40.00; Fee Totals; $70.00; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 01/09/2020; Concurrent: with case# 19CR-05809; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 200 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 100 Days; Conduct Credit: 100 Days; Comment: VOP #1; Programs; Residential Treatment Program to be determined; Ordered; Party: Christensen, Justin Allen; Order Date: 01/09/2020; Enroll by Date: 01/15/2020; Duration: 1 Years; Comment: City Team

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 002; VOP#1 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Found True by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Christensen, Justin Allen; Deputy Public Defender: Lee, Beth A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Christensen, Justin Allen; Deputy Public Defender: Lee, Beth A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas K; Defendant: Christensen, Justin Allen; Deputy Public Defender: Lee, Beth A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Hollman, James; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Christensen, Justin Allen; Deputy Public Defender: Lee, Beth A

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Christensen, Justin Allen; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC4573.5: Bring Drugs/Alcohol Into Penal Institution; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFingerprint Card; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Creeger, Matthew L; Defendant: Christensen, Justin Allen; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • ChargeCharges: Christensen, Justin Allen; Charge #: 001; Description: PC4573.5: Bring Drugs/Alcohol Into Penal Institution; Statute: 4573.5; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Madayag, Kimberly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McCoy, Tyson John

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gates, Kathryn