Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 05/30/2020 at 23:09:44 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Juan Pablo Melendez, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Juan Pablo Melendez, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bacciarini, Mark, Lo, Paul, Schechter, Jeanne, Mewhinney, Douglas V. and Jacobs, Harry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1652

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bacciarini, Mark

Lo, Paul

Schechter, Jeanne

Mewhinney, Douglas V.

Jacobs, Harry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Melendez, Juan Pablo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Madayag, Kimberly

Compton, Misty

Martinez, Mathew Joseph

Rosenthal, Sara R

Gates, Kathryn

Min, Thomas Keynes

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Lope, Armando

Green, Anthony C

Mclean, Todd Eugene

 

Court Documents

Stop Collection of Probation Fees

05/14/2020: Stop Collection of Probation Fees

Release Order

11/07/2019: Release Order

Release Order

11/06/2019: Release Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/06/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/30/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/21/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

10/03/2019: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

09/09/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/25/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/11/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/20/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/12/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

12/20/2017: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Court Collections Statement Letter

10/13/2017: Court Collections Statement Letter

* Public *

04/14/2017: * Public *

Motion

04/13/2017: Motion

Complaint

03/30/2017: Complaint

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStop Collection of Probation Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DispositionAmended Commitment; Charges; Charge Number: 001; 1st***PC4532(b)(1): Escape Jail/Charged w/Felony or Pending Fel; Commitment; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 04/14/2017; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 04/14/2020; Status; Status: Active; Date: 04/14/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 12/22/2017; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 09/09/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/07/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/21/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 11/06/2019; Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 11/06/2019; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 40 Days; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 20 Days; Conduct Credit: 20 Days; Comment: VOP (Credit for time served as of 11/6/2019); Programs; Residential Treatment Program to be determined; Ordered; Party: Melendez, Juan Pablo; Order Date: 11/06/2019; Enroll by Date: 11/07/2019; Duration: 6 Months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 004; VOP # 2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 004; VOP # 2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease Order; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Melendez, Juan Pablo; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Mewhinney, Douglas V.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: Melendez, Juan Pablo; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DispositionAmended Sentence; Charges; Charge Number: 001; 1st***PC4532(b)(1): Escape Jail/Charged w/Felony or Pending Fel; Sentence; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 04/14/2017; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 04/14/2020; Status; Status: Active; Date: 04/14/2017; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 12/22/2017; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 09/09/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/07/2019; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 004; VOP # 2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Martinez, Mathew Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Melendez, Juan Pablo; Deputy Public Defender: Mclean, Todd Eugene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 002; PC4532(b)(1): Escape Jail/Charged w/Felony or Pending Fel; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC4532(b)(2): Escape Jail/Etc While Chgd w/Fel:Force/Viol; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Min, Thomas Keynes; Defendant: Melendez, Juan Pablo; Deputy Public Defender: Green, Anthony C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Melendez, Juan Pablo; Charge #: 002; Description: PC4532(b)(1): Escape Jail/Charged w/Felony or Pending Fel; Statute: 4532(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Melendez, Juan Pablo; Charge #: 001; Description: 1st***PC4532(b)(1): Escape Jail/Charged w/Felony or Pending Fel; Statute: 4532(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • ChargeCharges: Melendez, Juan Pablo; Charge #: 001; Description: PC4532(b)(2): Escape Jail/Etc While Chgd w/Fel:Force/Viol; Statute: 4532(b)(2); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Madayag, Kimberly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gates, Kathryn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenthal, Sara R