Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/02/2020 at 14:29:10 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Juan Luis LongoriaQuezada, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/02/2017 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Juan Luis LongoriaQuezada, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul, Schechter, Jeanne, Kirihara, John and Jacobs, Harry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4678

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Schechter, Jeanne

Kirihara, John

Jacobs, Harry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendants

LongoriaQuezada, Juan Luis

Longoria, Juan Luis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hegland, Caleb

Rosenthal, Sara R

Compton, Misty

Turner, Leslie Allan

Defendant Attorneys

Coughlin, Michael

Andrade, Vincent

Meyer, Derek Scott

Lope, Armando

Boortz, Kimberly Ann

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

03/04/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

02/05/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Bail Bond

01/22/2019: Bail Bond

Criminal: Minute Order

01/22/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/18/2019: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

01/16/2019: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Criminal: Minute Order

12/14/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Affidavit of Probation Violation

12/06/2018: Affidavit of Probation Violation

Prohibited Person Relinquishment Form Findings

03/28/2018: Prohibited Person Relinquishment Form Findings

Criminal: Minute Order

02/21/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Notice

02/20/2018: Notice

Order

01/23/2018: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/23/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/27/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

11/13/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/25/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

08/02/2017: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

08/02/2017: Criminal: Minute Order

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • FinancialLongoriaQuezada, Juan Luis; Counter Payment; Receipt # CRIM-2019-01680; Quezada, Juan Luis Longoria; $10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • FinancialLongoriaQuezada, Juan Luis; Transaction Assessment; $10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • FinancialLongoriaQuezada, Juan Luis; Counter Payment; Receipt # CL-2019-07760; Balswick's Tire Shop, INc; $2570.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DispositionAmended Probation; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Probation; Probation; Type: Formal; Start Date: 01/23/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 01/23/2021; Status; Status: Active; Date: 01/23/2018; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 12/14/2018; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 01/18/2019; Status; Status: Revoked/Reinstated; Date: 03/04/2019; Comment; Comment: (); Adult Confinement; Type: Straight Local; Facility: County Jail; Start Date: 03/04/2019; Term Type: Confinement; Term: 30 Days; Suspended: 30 Days; Comment: VOP #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 005; vop # 2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); VOP Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 005; vop # 2 PC1203.2(a): Rearrest/Revoke Probation/Etc. (Specify Crime); Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketProof: Completion; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketBail Bond Exonerated; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketProof: Community Service; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketViolation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Compton, Misty; Defendant: LongoriaQuezada, Juan Luis; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Hegland, Caleb; Defendant: LongoriaQuezada, Juan Luis; Deputy Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketBail Review; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Schechter, Jeanne; Charges; Charge Number: 003; PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC243(c)(2): Battery On A Peace Officer With Injury; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Jacobs, Harry; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: LongoriaQuezada, Juan Luis; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2017
  • ChargeCharges: LongoriaQuezada, Juan Luis; Charge #: 003; Description: PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2017
  • ChargeCharges: LongoriaQuezada, Juan Luis; Charge #: 002; Description: PC243(c)(2): Battery On A Peace Officer With Injury; Statute: 243(c)(2); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2017
  • ChargeCharges: LongoriaQuezada, Juan Luis; Charge #: 001; Description: PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Statute: 69; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Turner, Leslie Allan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hegland, Caleb

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rosenthal, Sara R