This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/10/2020 at 01:22:45 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Joshua Thomas Rietz, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Joshua Thomas Rietz, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lo, Paul and Hansen, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******205B

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lo, Paul

Hansen, Ronald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Rietz, Joshua Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McCoy, Tyson John

Madayag, Kimberly

McKean, Tyler

Defendant Attorneys

Sok, Curtis Bonghoon

Lope, Armando

Reed, Katharine

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

08/09/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

08/09/2018: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

08/13/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

08/16/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

08/16/2018: Criminal: Minute Order (Amended)

Criminal: Minute Order

08/30/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/06/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/17/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

09/24/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

10/05/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

10/05/2018: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Abstract of Judgment

10/09/2018: Abstract of Judgment

Memorandum

11/06/2018: Memorandum

Criminal: Minute Order

11/09/2018: Criminal: Minute Order

Correspondence

09/25/2019: Correspondence

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRestitution; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DispositionPrison; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 10/05/2018; Consecutive: to Count 1; Term Type: Lower; Term: 2 Years; Comment: Enhancement 2 as to Count 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DispositionPrison; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: Prison; Facility: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation; Start Date: 10/05/2018; Term Type: Lower; Term: 2 Years; Credit for Time Served - Actual: 60 Days; Conduct Credit: 60 Days; Comment: Count 1 Felony; Condition - Adult; Fee Totals; $1,200.00; $40.00; $30.00; Fee Totals; $1,270.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Conviction - Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo Contendere; Charge Number: 001; PC186.22(b)(1)(B): Serious Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Stricken; Charge Number: 002; PC182(a)(1): Conspiracy: Commit Crime; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 002; PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Stricken; Charge Number: 003; PC186.22(a): Street Gang Act; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 004; PC594(2)(A): Amount of Defacement, Damage or Destruction is Less than $400; Dism: Motion of the People; Charge Number: 001; PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Admits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: McKean, Tyler; Defendant: Rietz, Joshua Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rietz, Joshua Thomas; Charge #: 004; Description: PC594(2)(A): Amount of Defacement, Damage or Destruction is Less than $400; Statute: 594(2)(A); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rietz, Joshua Thomas; Charge #: 003; Description: PC186.22(a): Street Gang Act; Statute: 186.22(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rietz, Joshua Thomas; Charge #: 002; Description: PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Statute: 186.22(b)(1)(A); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rietz, Joshua Thomas; Charge #: 002; Description: PC182(a)(1): Conspiracy: Commit Crime; Statute: 182(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rietz, Joshua Thomas; Charge #: 001; Description: PC186.22(b)(1)(A): Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Statute: 186.22(b)(1)(A); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rietz, Joshua Thomas; Charge #: 001; Description: PC186.22(b)(1)(B): Serious Felony Convic Street Gang Activity; Statute: 186.22(b)(1)(B); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • ChargeCharges: Rietz, Joshua Thomas; Charge #: 001; Description: PC245(a)(4): Assault-Force Likely to Produce GBI; Statute: 245(a)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed, Katharine

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sok, Curtis Bonghoon