This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 17:01:18 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Jose Maria Escalera, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jose Maria Escalera, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foster, David, Lo, Paul, Shaver, Donald and Ash, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2452

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foster, David

Lo, Paul

Shaver, Donald

Ash, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Escalera, Jose Maria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Kweon, Monica

Rosenthal, Sara R

Defendant Attorneys

Lee, Beth A

Shiffrin, Joshua P

Reed, Katharine

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

07/09/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

07/06/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/30/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/28/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/25/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

06/21/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

06/17/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

06/17/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Foster, David; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Escalera, Jose Maria; Deputy Public Defender: Reed, Katharine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Escalera, Jose Maria; Deputy Public Defender: Reed, Katharine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Escalera, Jose Maria; Deputy Public Defender: Reed, Katharine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Ash, Carol; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Rosenthal, Sara R; Defendant: Escalera, Jose Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Kweon, Monica; Defendant: Escalera, Jose Maria; Deputy Public Defender: Shiffrin, Joshua P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Trial Conference; Original Type: Pre-Trial Conference; Judicial Officer: Shaver, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Kweon, Monica; Defendant: Escalera, Jose Maria; Deputy Public Defender: Shiffrin, Joshua P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Escalera, Jose Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Escalera, Jose Maria; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shiffrin, Joshua P

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reed, Katharine

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, Beth A