Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 17:01:38 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Jose SotoSandoval

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jose SotoSandoval. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, Los Banos Division located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Moranda, David and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1780

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Los Banos Division

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Moranda, David

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Sotosandoval, Jose Luis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Pfeiff, Thomas M

Defendant Attorneys

Andrade, Vincent

Page, Kathleen Coleen

Noguera, Michael Anthony

 

Court Documents

Evaluation Request

05/27/2021: Evaluation Request

Criminal: Minute Order

05/26/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/12/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

05/07/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

05/07/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDoctor Report: PC1368; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvaluation Request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Pfeiff, Thomas M; Defendant: SotoSandoval, Jose Luis; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketBHRS Assessment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 002; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 003; PC242: Battery; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 004; PC243(b): Battery On Peace Officer/Etc; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 005; PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 006; PC602(m): Trespass:Occupy Property Without Consent; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 007; PC459: Burglary; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 008; PC594(a): Vandalism; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint; Judicial Officer: Moranda, David; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Pfeiff, Thomas M; Defendant: SotoSandoval, Jose Luis; Deputy Public Defender: Page, Kathleen Coleen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Charges; Charge Number: 007; PC459: Burglary; Arrest Only; Charge Number: 008; PC594(a): Vandalism; Arrest Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Sotosandoval, Jose Luis; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SotoSandoval, Jose Luis; Charge #: 008; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SotoSandoval, Jose Luis; Charge #: 007; Description: PC459: Burglary; Statute: 459; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SotoSandoval, Jose Luis; Charge #: 006; Description: PC602(m): Trespass:Occupy Property Without Consent; Statute: 602(m); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SotoSandoval, Jose Luis; Charge #: 005; Description: PC148(a)(1): Obstruct/Resist Public Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SotoSandoval, Jose Luis; Charge #: 004; Description: PC243(b): Battery On Peace Officer/Etc; Statute: 243(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SotoSandoval, Jose Luis; Charge #: 003; Description: PC242: Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SotoSandoval, Jose Luis; Charge #: 002; Description: PC594(a): Vandalism; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SotoSandoval, Jose Luis; Charge #: 001; Description: PC69: Obstruct/Resist Executive Officer; Statute: 69; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noguera, Michael Anthony

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Page, Kathleen Coleen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent