This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 18:01:17 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Jose Luis Banuelosvillarreal, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jose Luis Banuelosvillarreal, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Slocum, Steven and Lo, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5650

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Slocum, Steven

Lo, Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Banuelosvillarreal, Jose Luis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Serratto, Matthew Travers

Gates, Kathryn

Defendant Attorneys

Galeon, Erica Joy

Andrade, Vincent

Meyer, Derek Scott

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

11/24/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

11/24/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

12/02/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

12/02/2021: Felony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

Order

12/02/2021: Order

Criminal: Minute Order

01/05/2022: Criminal: Minute Order

Order

01/05/2022: Order

Collection Statement

01/07/2022: Collection Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • FinancialBanuelosvillarreal, Jose Luis; Transaction Assessment; $1310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Collections Statement Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketProhibited Person Relinquishment Form Findings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketFirearms Relinquishment Hearing; Original Type: Firearms Relinquishment Hearing; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Original Type: Sentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Defendant: Banuelosvillarreal, Jose Luis; Deputy Public Defender: Galeon, Erica Joy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketProbation Recommendation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCourt Collections Order of Referral for Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketTranscript

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCourt Collections Follow-up

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFelony Advisement of Rights, Waiver and Plea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Gates, Kathryn; Defendant: Banuelosvillarreal, Jose Luis; Deputy Public Defender: Meyer, Derek Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(a): Inflict Corporal Injury On Spouse/Cohabitant; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Serratto, Matthew Travers; Defendant: Banuelosvillarreal, Jose Luis; Deputy Public Defender: Andrade, Vincent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Banuelosvillarreal, Jose Luis; Charge #: 001; Description: PC236: False Imprisonment; Statute: 236; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meyer, Derek Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Galeon, Erica Joy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrade, Vincent