Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Merced County Superior Courts on 07/06/2021 at 18:00:54 (UTC).

People of the State of California, Plaintiff(s) vs. Jonathan William Sommerfeld, Defendant(s)

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 People of the State of California, Plaintiff s filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jonathan William Sommerfeld, Defendant s. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts, New Merced Courthouse located in Merced, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hansen, Ronald, Lo, Paul and Slocum, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1776

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Merced County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Merced Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Merced, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hansen, Ronald

Lo, Paul

Slocum, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Sommerfeld, Jonathan William

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nored, Thane

Her, Lee

Defendant Attorneys

Foster, Douglas

Lope, Armando

 

Court Documents

Criminal: Minute Order

06/09/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Criminal: Minute Order

05/12/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

Complaint

05/07/2021: Complaint

Criminal: Minute Order

05/07/2021: Criminal: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Examination; Judicial Officer: TBA, Judge; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Her, Lee; Defendant: Sommerfeld, Jonathan William; Contract Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOrder: Request for Hearing on Protective Order Modification; Judicial Officer: Slocum, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketPretrial Electronic Monitoring Program Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketBail Review; Original Type: Bail Review; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-Preliminary; Original Type: Pre-Preliminary; Judicial Officer: Hansen, Ronald; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Her, Lee; Defendant: Sommerfeld, Jonathan William; Contract Public Defender: Lope, Armando

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketBail Review Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Charges; Charge Number: 001; PC273.5(f)(1): Domestic Violence with Injury, Prior Conviction; Not Guilty; Charge Number: 001; PC12022.7(e): GBI:Domestic Violence; Denied; Charge Number: 001; EC1109 : Prior Domestic Violence Evidence; Denied; Charge Number: 002; PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketOrder: Criminal Protective; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketPolice Report/Incident Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketArraignment: Complaint - Video; Original Type: Arraignment: Complaint - Video; Judicial Officer: Lo, Paul; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard / Held; Parties Present; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Deputy District Attorney: Nored, Thane; Defendant: Sommerfeld, Jonathan William; Contract Public Defender: Foster, Douglas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Sommerfeld, Jonathan William; Charge #: 002; Description: PC273.6(a): Violate Court Order-Prevent Domestic Violence; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Sommerfeld, Jonathan William; Charge #: 001; Description: EC1109 : Prior Domestic Violence Evidence; Statute: 1109; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Sommerfeld, Jonathan William; Charge #: 001; Description: PC12022.7(e): GBI:Domestic Violence; Statute: 12022.7(e); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Sommerfeld, Jonathan William; Charge #: 001; Description: PC273.5(f)(1): Domestic Violence with Injury, Prior Conviction; Statute: 273.5(f)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lope, Armando

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foster, Douglas